MD SB371 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that provisions of law concerning the Sunday sale of alcoholic beverages in Garrett County apply to a precinct of an election district in which the voters in a referendum authorized by law approve Sunday sales; specifying that provisions of law concerning Sunday sales apply to a holder of a Class D license operating an establishment that meets four specifications; and providing for specified fees.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Elections
Fees
Garrett County
Referendum
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Elections
Fees
Garrett County
Referendum
Restaurants