MD SB371 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing each health occupations board to take disciplinary action against a health care practitioner who fails to comply with an order from the Governor relating to catastrophic health emergencies, subject to the hearing provisions that govern the discipline of that health care practitioner by each respective board; etc.
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Discipline of Health Care Practitioners - Failure
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Diseases
Emergencies
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Licenses
Physicians
Discipline
Diseases
Emergencies
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Licenses
Physicians