MD SB37 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners to maintain on the Board's website an electronic roster of individuals registered and licensed to practice massage therapy; phasing out the option for an individual to be registered by the Board to practice massage therapy in a setting that is not a health care setting; altering the educational requirements for licensure or registration as a massage therapist to include 750 contact hours in a certain approved curriculum; etc.
Title
Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Requiring License to Practice and Other Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-16) |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {793421/1 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {873727/1 Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB220 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Subjects
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Electronic Government
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
internet
Licenses
Massage
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Electronic Government
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
internet
Licenses
Massage
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 6 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 6 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 6 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 6 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 6 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 6 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 6 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |