MD SB369 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a local department of social services with a military installation in its jurisdiction to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the Military Family Advocacy Program for that installation; and establishing certain requirements for a memorandum of understanding under the Act.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB646 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 705.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |