MD SB369 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting, under specified circumstances, a health care practitioner who has a specified compensation arrangement with a health care entity from a provision of law that prohibits a health care practitioner from referring a patient or directing specified persons to refer a patient to a specified health care entity; providing that the exemption is null and void if the Maryland Insurance Commissioner issues a specified order; etc.
Title
Maryland Patient Referral Law - Compensation Arrangements Under Federally Approved Programs and Models
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {157077/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Notices
Patients
Salaries and Compensation
Disclosure
Exemptions
Federal Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Medical Assistance
Notices
Patients
Salaries and Compensation