MD SB364 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 1:00 pm House Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Election Day Page Program to stimulate student interest in elections, provide assistance to election judges, and assist elderly and disabled voters at polling places; requiring the State Board of Elections to develop a page training program for use by participating local boards that includes the duties, responsibilities, and prohibited conduct of pages at polling places; requiring participating local boards, in collaboration with local school systems, to establish a procedure for the selection of pages; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Election Day Page Program - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-06SenateFloor Amendment {183423/2 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {614635/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-05SenateLaid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {614635/1
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback