MD SB361 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court after a certain finding of incompetency or not criminally responsible due to a mental disorder to order the Maryland Department of Health as soon as possible after the defendant's admission, but not later than 48 hours, to evaluate a defendant, to develop a treatment plan, and to make a determination as to whether the defendant is a danger to self or others under certain circumstances; requiring a panel to convene within 9 days after a certain individual's refusal of medication for certain purposes: etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {358472/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drugs
Health, Department of
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
State Hospitals
Time
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drugs
Health, Department of
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
State Hospitals
Time