MD SB354 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain county that has established an effective agricultural land preservation program to establish and collect, by public local law, ordinance, or resolution, a certain agricultural land preservation fee in accordance with certain requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation Fee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-06SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback