MD SB353 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition against operating golf carts on certain highways in the City of Crisfield in Somerset County; repealing the authority of the State Highway Administration to designate a location for golf carts to cross certain highways in the City Crisfield; and lowering the maximum speed limit from 35 to 30 miles per hour for a highway on which a person may operate a golf cart in the City of Crisfield.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {690612/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Somerset County
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Somerset County
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road