MD SB353 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person who is negotiating a specified solar installation and interconnection contract with specified customer-generator to submit to the customer-generator's electric company a specified application; allowing a specified person to accept a payment from the customer-generator in connection with the contract before receiving an approval from the customer-generator's electric company; prohibiting a specified person to begin a specified installation under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - New Interconnection Agreement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {597479/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |