MD SB350 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Institute for Urban Research at Morgan State University to convene a task force to foster reconciliation and inclusionary justice and work toward achieving racial equity by taking certain actions; requiring the task force to include certain members and consult with certain governmental units; requiring the task force to hold hearings, study and make recommendations regarding certain matters, and monitor and evaluate the implementation of certain recommendations using certain criteria; terminating the Act; etc.
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Discrimination
Education
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Health
Hearings
Historical Matters
Housing
Human Relations
Human Rights
Minorities
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Discrimination
Education
Ethnic Affairs
Gender
Health
Hearings
Historical Matters
Housing
Human Relations
Human Rights
Minorities
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor and Employment