MD SB350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Institute for Urban Research at Morgan State University to convene a task force to foster reconciliation and inclusionary justice and work toward achieving racial equity by taking certain actions; requiring the task force to include certain members and consult with certain governmental units; requiring the task force to hold hearings, study and make recommendations regarding certain matters, and monitor and evaluate the implementation of certain recommendations using certain criteria; terminating the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417
2018-04-02SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-30HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-03-20HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
2018-03-19HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-20HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-20SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-19SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-07SenateHearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.
2018-01-26SenateHearing canceled
2018-02-07SenateHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback