MD SB346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-05 - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-05 - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirements that the Department of Natural Resources provide public notice of certain administrative actions through publication in certain newspapers; authorizing the Department when closing an area of State waters to fishing to provide the public notice on the Department's website and through certain other media so an affected person has the opportunity to be informed; repealing certain requirements that the Department hold certain hearings or provide public notice before certain regulations take effect; etc.
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Boats and Ships
Clams
Fish and Fishing
Hearings
internet
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
News Media
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Social Media
Time
Water
Boats and Ships
Clams
Fish and Fishing
Hearings
internet
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
News Media
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Social Media
Time
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 1009.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 1039 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 1043 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 11A-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 739 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 742 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 8 | 721 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0346?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0346f.pdf |