MD SB344 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Approving certain projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of certain academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; approving the issuance of bonds by the University System of Maryland in a total principal amount of $20,000,000 for financing the projects; providing that the bonds issued under the authority of the Act are not a debt or obligation of the State or any of its subdivisions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-18HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (129-2)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-03-17HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-18SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-01-23SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback