MD SB343 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain procedures regarding the persons who may establish or receive distributions from an ABLE account in the Maryland ABLE Program for a certain eligible individual; and requiring the Maryland 529 Board to adopt certain procedures regarding the establishment and operation of an ABLE account by a person other than a certain designated beneficiary.
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Account Establishment - Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {573221/1 Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB354 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Referred Rules
Subjects
accessibility
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabled
Education
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabled
Education
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 19C-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 19C-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |