MD SB343 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person to obtain a license from the Department of Natural Resources before catching shrimp for commercial purposes; and authorizing the Department to adopt certain regulations governing any aspect of the shrimp fishery, including regulations establishing and implementing a pilot program related to fishing for shrimp.
Title
Natural Resources - Shrimp Fishery - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Animals
Commerce and Business
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Commerce and Business
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |