MD SB335 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, on or before December 1, 2017, with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation and the Governor's Workforce Development Board statewide goals that reach 45% for the percentages of high school students who complete specified requirements; requiring specified entities to develop specified earnings goals; requiring the Division of Workforce Development to create specified apprenticeship programs; allowing a specified tax credit for employing a specified apprentice; etc.
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2017-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {787170/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Apprentices
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Education
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Income Tax
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Education
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Income Tax
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment