MD SB332 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Board of Directors of the Maryland African American Museum Corporation.
Title
Maryland African American Museum Corporation - Board of Directors - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {623225/1 Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB690 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Minorities
Museums
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor, and Employment
Corporations
Minorities
Museums
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 2603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |