MD SB327 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a method of electing judges of the orphans' courts on a nonpartisan basis, without regard to political party affiliation; establishing a primary election for candidates for nomination for a specified office to be administered in a specified manner; authorizing any registered voter, with or without any political party affiliation, to participate in such a primary; prohibiting candidates from appearing on primary ballots under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424731/1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {424731/1 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |