MD SB326 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to July 1, 2021, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators; altering the composition of the Board; clarifying that the Department of the Environment is responsible for the enforcement of specified provisions; repealing obsolete language; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2020; and requiring the Board to make a specified report on or before October 1, 2011.
Title
Environment - State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Sunset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-02-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Examinations
Fees
Licenses
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Sunset
Water
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Examinations
Fees
Licenses
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Sunset
Water