MD SB325 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the salary of the Washington County Sheriff to be 90% of the salary of the State's Attorney of Washington County; and repealing the requirement for the Washington County Salary Study Commission to study and issue a report that contains recommendations relating to the salary of the Sheriff of Washington County.
Title
Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB197 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Washington County
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 15 | 422 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 28 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |