MD SB322 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt certain health and wellness standards for certain health care facilities; providing that certain standards may exceed the standards set by federal law; establishing the Correctional Facilities Health and Wellness Pilot Program to establish minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services for participating correctional facilities; requiring each participating facility to comply with certain health and wellness standards, offer plant-based meals, and provide certain information to inmates; etc.
Title
Health – Health and Wellness Standards – Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Continuing Education
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Equipment
Food
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Minorities
Prices
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Communications
Continuing Education
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Equipment
Food
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Minorities
Prices
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |