MD SB319 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (108-28)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program to include loans for water efficiency projects, environmental remediation projects intended to remove environmental or health hazards, and resiliency projects to increase the capacity of a property to withstand the effects of climate change; adding water efficiency projects, environmental remediation, resiliency projects, and grid resiliency projects to the list of items that require eligibility requirements under a certain ordinance; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (108-28)
2021-04-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {550210/1 Adopted
2021-04-12HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Withdrawn
2021-04-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {550210/1
2021-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-18HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-02-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {904532/1 Adopted
2021-02-05SenateMotion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2021-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {904532/1
2021-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-06SenateHearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-09-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB517 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11103(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11104(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11105(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback