MD SB319 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide ridership services on transit vehicles to any permanent employee in any unit of the Executive Branch of State government, including a unit with an independent personnel system; prohibiting the Administration from collecting fees or reimbursement for certain transit services; and requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation and the Department of Budget and Management to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the cost and feasibility of expanding the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-38) (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (99-38)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFloor Amendment {803122/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Withdrawn
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-26HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-02-25SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2019-02-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-21SenateFloor Amendment {723823/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {387479/1 Finance Report Adopted
2019-02-20SenateLaid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2019-02-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {387479/1
2019-02-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0319&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0319f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0319t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_420_sb0319t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0319_38747901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0319_72382301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0319_80312201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0319.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0319_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0289.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0319_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1147.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback