MD SB319 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the commissions from 5.5% to 6% that specified licensed agents receive from specified lottery ticket sales.
Title
State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |