MD SB318 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the determination of the amount of the standard deduction allowed for an individual under the Maryland income tax; altering the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of certain standard deductions allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain taxable years by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Income Tax – Standard Deduction – Alteration and Cost–of–Living Adjustments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84) (Y: 53 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84) (Y: 53 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 577 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment {523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84) |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {155465/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |