MD SB318 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility criteria under the cybersecurity investment incentive tax credit to provide the credit to a specified qualified investor in a specified qualified Maryland cybersecurity company rather than providing the credit to the company; altering the definition of "company" to include an entity that becomes duly organized and existing under specified laws and for the purpose of conducting business for profit within a specified time period; and extending the termination date of the credit.
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {589234/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |