MD SB315 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring local ethics commissions or other appropriate entities to certify to the State Ethics Commission compliance with specified provisions of law relating to elected local officials on or before a specified date each year; requiring conflict of interest and financial disclosure provisions for elected local officials enacted by a county or municipal corporation to be equivalent to or exceed requirements under specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Public Ethics Laws - Elected Local Officials and Board of Education Members -
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. George Della [D] |
Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-20 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Laid Over (Senator Mooney) Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Ethics
Municipal Corporations
Political Candidates
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Ethics
Municipal Corporations
Political Candidates
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations