MD SB313 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB725
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in partnership with the Department of Aging, the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council, and the Greater Maryland Chapter of the Alzheimer's Association, to incorporate information regarding certain types of cognitive impairment into outreach programs administered by the Maryland Department of Health to educate health care providers and increase understanding of certain types of cognitive impairment.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB119 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
SB725 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB725 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Demographics
Diseases
Elderly Persons
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Information
Age
Demographics
Diseases
Elderly Persons
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Information
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 18 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |