MD SB312 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB94

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under certain circumstances for golf carts on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, or Taylors Island in Dorchester County; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway on Upper Hoopers Island, Middle Hoopers Island, or Taylors Island may operate the golf cart only on highways on which the maximum speed does not exceed 30 miles per hour between dawn and dusk and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2021-01-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-01-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-01-26SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-01-26SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-10-13SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB279 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
SB94 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Referred Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback