MD SB311 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Second Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Second Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making specified requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a certain request to be made in a certain manner; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet specified requirements; establishing specified requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a specified form; etc.
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Rejected (23-23) (Y: 24 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-29) (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-29) (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Failed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (23-23) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {468672/1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {468672/1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-29) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {468672/1 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Advance Medical Directives
Beneficiaries
Contracts
Data
Death
Drugs
Evidence
Forms
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Insurance
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Murder
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Vital Records
Witnesses
Beneficiaries
Contracts
Data
Death
Drugs
Evidence
Forms
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Insurance
Liability
Mental and Behavioral Health
Murder
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Vital Records
Witnesses