MD SB311 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of State procurement law; altering the dollar value threshold that triggers the requirement to publish notice in eMaryland Marketplace; specifying a preferred procurement method for human, social, cultural, or educational services; establishing qualification based selection as the method of procurement for specified procurements; clarifying the authority of the board of trustees of a community college to advertise specified bids on eMaryland Marketplace; etc.
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {754336/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Advertising
Community Colleges
Construction
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
General Services, Department of
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Records
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Community Colleges
Construction
Contracts
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
General Services, Department of
Notices
Prices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Records
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement