MD SB311 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual who is at least 21 years old to conduct a home game involving wagering if the home game is conducted in a specified manner; and limiting to $2,000 the total amount of money, tokens representing money, or any other thing or consideration of value that may be wagered by all players during any 24-hour period.
Title
Gaming - Home Games
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 a.m. |
2016-04-08 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2016-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {659134/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |