MD SB31 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to act as the group-wide supervisor for an internationally active insurance group; authorizing the Commissioner to acknowledge another regulatory official as the group-wide supervisor for a certain internationally active insurance group; authorizing a certain insurance holding company system to request that the Commissioner make a certain determination or acknowledgment of a group-wide supervisor for the system; etc.
Title
Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {807073/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Federal Government
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Rules and Regulations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Rules and Regulations