MD SB306 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 548
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing the State Board of Dental Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending until July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring the Board to submit a report by December 1, 2020 to certain committees of the General Assembly on the status of staff vacancies, the strategy used to fill the vacancies, and the Board's complaint and enforcement process for the past 5 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Dental Examiners – Sunset Extension and Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 548
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-02HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {104539/1 Adopted
2020-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-23SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-22SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB391 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-28 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations4201(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations4702(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback