MD SB305 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1003
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the meaning of "newspaper" or "newspaper in general circulation" when referring to the publication of a certain legal advertisement or legal notice to include certain publications that are offered in a print format or through a dedicated website under certain circumstances.
Title
Legal Advertisement or Legal Notice – Publication in Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Online Newspapers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB305 (Carry Over) 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
HB79 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
HB79 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Comptroller
Emergencies
Energy Matters
Home Improvement
Income Tax
Local Government - Generally
Reports
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Tax Credits
Comptroller
Emergencies
Energy Matters
Home Improvement
Income Tax
Local Government - Generally
Reports
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Tax Credits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 1 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0305?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0305f.pdf |