MD SB297 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB55

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the maximum speed limit for all expressways and interstate highways that connect with Interstate 495 in the State be the same as for Interstate 495 at the point of connection for 5 miles from the point of entrance to or exit from Interstate 495; and requiring the State Highway Administration to post notice of the maximum speed limit for an expressway at no greater than 5-mile intervals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-10-20SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB55 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21801.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback