MD SB295 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB415
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution relating to the selection and tenure of circuit court judges; altering the method of filling vacancies in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for retention elections following an appointment to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for a transitional period under which the terms of certain amendments are to become effective; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-03 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB415 (Carry Over) 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Age
Ballots
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Death
Elections
Judges
Referendum
Retirement
Voting
Ballots
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Death
Elections
Judges
Referendum
Retirement
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
XVIII - Provisions of Limited Duration | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5A | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0295?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0295f.pdf |