MD SB293 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a title insurer to conduct a required annual review of a title insurance producer in person, remotely by using mail, overnight delivery, or electronic means, or by a combination of in-person and remote methods.
Title
Insurance - Title Insurance Producers - Annual Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {663921/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB637 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Communications
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Postal Service
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Titles
Communications
Electronic Communication
Examinations
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Postal Service
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Titles