MD SB289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an agent of a certain applicant from making a contribution to a member of the governing body of Frederick County during the pendency of a certain application; requiring certain members of the Frederick County Board of Zoning Appeals, Ethics Commission, or Planning Commission or the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County who establish an authorized candidate campaign committee to vacate office no more than 48 hours after opening a campaign account through a campaign finance entity; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Elections
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Frederick County
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Public Officials
Zoning and Planning
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Elections
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Frederick County
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Public Officials
Zoning and Planning