MD SB286 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to bury the eligible spouse or dependent of a veteran in a State veterans' cemetery without charge.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Burial in State Veterans' Cemeteries - Spouses and Dependents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {213529/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB480 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Subjects
Cemeteries
Spouses
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Spouses
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |