MD SB286 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that an owner, a keeper, or a harborer of a dog is liable for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog under specified circumstances; prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's or renter's insurance, from refusing to underwrite a risk or denying, canceling, or refusing to renew coverage solely because an applicant or insured owns, keeps, or harbors a specific breed of dog; requiring a specified additional cost to be imposed in specified criminal cases; etc.
Title
Animals - Civil Liability and Insurance Coverage for Dogs and Court Costs for Animal-Related Crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Animals
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Comptroller
Counties
Court Costs
Criminal Law - Procedure
Damages
Death
District Courts
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Leases and Rent
Liability
Real Property
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Comptroller
Counties
Court Costs
Criminal Law - Procedure
Damages
Death
District Courts
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Leases and Rent
Liability
Real Property