MD SB286 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Governor's P-20 Leadership Council of Maryland, a partnership among the State, educators, and the business community to better prepare Maryland students for jobs of the 21st century while enhancing the State's economic competitiveness by creating a workforce with 21st-century skills; providing for the membership, tenure, chair, and staffing of the Council; establishing an Executive Committee; providing for the duties of the Executive Committee and Council; and requiring the Council to submit an annual report.
Title
Governor's P-20 Leadership Council of Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-10) | |
2010-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Ways and Means & Appropriations | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |