MD SB284 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply, by September 1, 2018, to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for an amendment to a certain waiver to implement a pilot program to provide limited dental coverage to certain individuals; requiring the Department to administer the program under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the status of a certain application on or before December 1, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {877376/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-07SenateHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback