MD SB283 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Behavioral Health Workforce Investment Fund to provide reimbursement for costs associated with educating, training, certifying, recruiting, placing, and retaining behavioral health professionals and paraprofessionals; providing that money expended from the Fund is supplemental to and not intended to supplant other funding; and requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in coordination with certain other agencies, to conduct a comprehensive behavioral health workforce needs assessment by October 1, 2024.
Title
Mental Health - Workforce Development - Fund Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-5) |
2023-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {773426/1 Adopted |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {763921/1 Adopted |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB418 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
studies
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
studies
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 1602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |