MD SB281 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment to waive certain application fees for applicants intending to use certain contaminated properties for clean or renewable electrical generation sites under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations; requiring that the owner of a certain eligible property that wants to change the use of the eligible property be liable for certain fees waived under the Act under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-03-12HouseReferred Economic Matters
2020-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {244337/1 Adopted
2020-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-27SenateHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-01-27SenateHearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-01-27SenateHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-01-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB336 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment7501(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment7506(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General8402(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback