MD SB279 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB816
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture to develop, publish, and regularly update a fact sheet on the care and protection of pets in the event of an eviction or any other loss of possession of real property; requiring a landlord to provide a link to the fact sheet at the execution of a lease on or after November 1, 2023; requiring a sheriff or any other official to return a pet to a tenant or certain other person or to contact an animal shelter or rescue organization; prohibiting the leaving of a pet on public property; etc.
Title
Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {213922/1 Adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB102 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
SB816 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
SB816 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Courts
Disclosure
internet
Landlords and Tenants
Law Enforcement
Notices
Public Information
Real Property
Sheriffs
Animals
Courts
Disclosure
internet
Landlords and Tenants
Law Enforcement
Notices
Public Information
Real Property
Sheriffs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 15 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |