MD SB279 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB618
Note: Carry Over of previous SB990
Note: Carry Over of previous SB990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the establishment of an Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program by a community-based organization to provide a place for the consumption of preobtained drugs, provide sterile needles, administer first aid, and provide certain other services; providing that the Maryland Department of Health may approve not more than six programs, with two in urban areas, two in suburban areas, and two in rural areas, that operate at a single location in an area with a high incidence of drug use; etc.
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Services Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB279 (Carry Over) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
HB396 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-16 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
SB990 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB396 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-16 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
SB990 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
AIDS
Clinics
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Demographics
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Ethics
Gifts
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Identification
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Public Health
Reports
Reproductive Matters
Rural Areas
Safety
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Time
Urban Areas
Work, Labor, and Employment
Clinics
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Demographics
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Equipment
Ethics
Gifts
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Identification
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Public Health
Reports
Reproductive Matters
Rural Areas
Safety
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Time
Urban Areas
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 24 | 1801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0279?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0279f.pdf |