MD SB279 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified notices and statements relating to homeowner's insurance to be delivered by electronic means if the insurer complies with specified requirements; authorizing insurers to comply with specified renewal notice requirements relating to homeowner's insurance by sending a specified notice; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt by regulation a specified notice to be provided to insureds and policyholders at each renewal that contains specified information; etc.
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Notices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {367173/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Forms
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Notices
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Forms
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Notices
Real Property
Rules and Regulations