MD SB279 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an individual who applies to register to vote or update an existing voter registration online to provide specified information; providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to register to vote or update an existing voter registration address and vote during early voting; requiring proof of residency to register or update an existing voter registration address during early voting; specifying methods of requesting an absentee ballot, including through an accessible online application; etc.
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-9) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-37) (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-12) (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {653921/2 Rejected (18-29) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (38-7) (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-37) (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-12) (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {653921/2 Rejected (18-29) (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (38-7) (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-9) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-37) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {965060/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {743926/1 Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {653921/2 Rejected (18-29) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {664735/1 Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (38-7) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {184239/1 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {184239/1 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ballots
Contractors
Disabilities
Drivers' Licenses
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Facsimile Transmission
Identification
Judges
Local Government Mandates
Postal Service
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Voting
Contractors
Disabilities
Drivers' Licenses
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Facsimile Transmission
Identification
Judges
Local Government Mandates
Postal Service
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Security
Voting